This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/15/2016 at 10:06:30 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS. HENG, ALBERT H.

Case Summary

On 04/28/2008 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HENG, ALBERT H. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, El Monte Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LYNN D. OLSON and VICKEN I. SIMONIAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1449

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LYNN D. OLSON

VICKEN I. SIMONIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

HENG ALBERT H.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE BRACHFELD LAW GROUP, P.C. - ERICA L. BRACHFELD

Attorney at THE BRACHFELD LAW GROUP, P.C.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2012
  • DocketCASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2009
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2009
  • DocketNOTICE RE: COURT TRIAL HEARING FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2009
  • DocketMATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 06/11/09 AT 08:30P M, IN DEPT. 001 . RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2009
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 09:00A M, IN DEPT. 001 , HON. LYNN D. OLSON PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS DISCHARGED. MATTER IS SET FOR COURT TRIAL ON 09/10/09 AT 1:30PM IN DIVISION 001. ... *PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2009
  • DocketMATTER SET FOR COURT TRIAL ON 09/10/09 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 001 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2009
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2009
  • DocketMATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 06/11/09 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 001 . RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2009
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 01:30A M, IN DEPT. 001 , HON. VICKEN I. SIMONIAN PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: CASE MANAGEMENT . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: MATTER IS SET FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON 6/11/09 AT 8:30 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT 001.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2009
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2008
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS AS TO (HENG, ALBERT) RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO DEPT. 001 FOR CONSIDERATION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2008
  • DocketANSWER FILED OF (HENG, ALBERT) ERRONEUSLY SUED AS (HENG, ALBERT H.) . RECEIPT # CRC985 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2008
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (HENG, ALBERT) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2008
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY LYNN D. OLSON TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(F). THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SET FOR 11-04-08 IS HEREBY VACATED MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING ON 04/23/09 AT 09:00A M., IN DEPT. 001 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED /GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/ COUNSEL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2008
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, ADR PKG, CASE ASSIGNMENT, LIMITED CIVIL CASE FILED. SERVED AS TO (HENG, ALBERT H.) . COSTS OF $ 56.00 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2008
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN ELM236112030.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2008
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2008
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2008
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT/DIV. 001 OF HONORABLE LYNN D. OLSON .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2008
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY LYNN D. OLSON TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 11/04/08 AT 09:00A M., IN DEPT. 001 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brachfeld, Erica L