Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/13/2016 at 12:33:50 (UTC).

MEZRAHI, CLAIRE VS ROBIN, ANDREW

Case Summary

On 08/02/2006 MEZRAHI, CLAIRE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ROBIN, ANDREW. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0670

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Los Angeles Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEZRAHI CLAIRE

Defendant

ROBIN ANDREW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AKBARIAN ESQ, ANIE N

Defendant Attorney

RUBEN, ANDREW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2006
  • WRIT REJECTED: COMPLETE THE NAME OF DEBTOR AS SHOWN ON THE JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2006
  • COURT TRIAL CONCLUDED - JUDGMENT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2006
  • FAILURE TO APPEAR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2006
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2006
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2006
  • COURT TRIAL SET FOR 09/26/06, 08:30 AM, DEPT 92

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2006
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED- 1 HR(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2006
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2006
  • FEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2006
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2006
  • A/C - ATTORNEY UPDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2006
  • PARTIAL PAYMENT FOR FILING FEE FOR COMPLAINT IN THE AMOUNT OF $120.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2006
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2006
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2006
  • PARTIAL PAYMENT FOR FILING FEE FOR COMPLAINT IN THE AMOUNT OF $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer AKBARIAN ANIE N. ESQ