This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/14/2016 at 23:22:52 (UTC).

MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY VS. SHAPIRO, BARRY

Case Summary

On 04/16/2008 MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SHAPIRO, BARRY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Clarita Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KEVIL W. MARTIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0924

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Clarita Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KEVIL W. MARTIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

ACTIVE ADJUSTERS

SHAPIRO BARRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GERTZ & LAURIE - JOHN D LAURIE

Attorney at GERTZ & LAURIE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2010
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2010
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 04/27/10 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2008
  • PURSUANT TO ALEXIS ORTEGA, ESQ., COUNSEL FOR MOVING PARTY, MOTIONS SET FOR NOVEMBER 12, 2008 ARE OFF CALENDAR TRIAL/HEARING DATE PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2008
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2008
  • PURSUANT TO ALEXIS ORTEGA CALLING FROM PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TRIAL/HEARING DATE PLACED OFF CALENDAR. MOTION SET FOR NOVEMBER 12, 2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2008
  • NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES; REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS , DECLARATION, AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF FILED. RECEIPT # NEW253967007 . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 11/12/08 AT 01:45P M, IN DEPT. 004 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2008
  • NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION AND TO COMPEL PRODUCTION; REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS , DECLARATION, AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF FILED. RECEIPT # NEW253967008 . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 11/12/08 AT 01:45P M, IN DEPT. 004 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2008
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2008
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY) FOR REJECTION OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. PAGE 2 OF 4 IS MISSING. SUBMITTED ON 09/03/08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2008
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (ACTIVE ADJUSTERS) . COSTS OF $ 56.50 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (SHAPIRO, BARRY) . COSTS OF $ 56.50 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2008
  • ANSWER FILED OF (SHAPIRO, BARRY) . RECEIPT # WAIVER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2008
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (SHAPIRO, BARRY) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2008
  • APPLICATION(S) FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (SHAPIRO, BARRY) IS GRANTED. APPLICANT(S) MAY PROCEED IN THIS ACTION WITHOUT PAYMENT OF ANY COURT FEES OR COSTS LISTED IN RULE 985(I), CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2008
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN NEW253967026.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2008
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2008
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2008
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT/DIV. 004 OF HONORABLE KEVIL W. MARTIN, COMMISSIONER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2008
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 09/12/08 AT 08:00A M, IN DIV/DEPT. CLK . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 04/16/08

    Read MoreRead Less