This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/15/2016 at 07:29:30 (UTC).

MENDOZA NAVA, LEONEL VS RIOS, SILVESTRE

Case Summary

On 02/25/2009 MENDOZA NAVA, LEONEL filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against RIOS, SILVESTRE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, San Pedro Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0231

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MENDOZA NAVA LEONEL

Defendants

PEREZ HERNAN

RIOS SILVESTRE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FIERSTADT, EDWARD T

Defendant Attorney

PEREZ, HERNAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2009
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL MINUTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2009
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2009
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2009
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 06/01/09, 01:30 PM, DEPT 88

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2009
  • DocketMEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-30 MIN(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2009
  • DocketSUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2009
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FOR ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2009
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2009
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTRED AS TO ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO CCP 415.46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2009
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2009
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND NOT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2009
  • DocketRESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2009
  • DocketFEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2009
  • DocketMOTION FILED: MOTION TO STRIKE CCP 92 D HEARING SET FOR 3/26/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2009
  • DocketMOTION RULING ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2009
  • DocketRESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2009
  • DocketFEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2009
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2009
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2009
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less