This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/30/2016 at 05:54:22 (UTC).

MENDOZA, JULIO VS. MARQUEZ, THOMAS

Case Summary

On 09/24/2009 MENDOZA, JULIO filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MARQUEZ, THOMAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Huntington Park Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1289

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MENDOZA JULIO

Defendants

MARQUEZ RITA

MARQUEZ THOMAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JEFFREY F. SKLAN - JEFFREY F. SKLAN

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JEFFREY F. SKLAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2011
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2011
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 01/11/11 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2009
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2009
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 10/29/09 , FOR (MENDOZA, JULIO) , AGAINST (MARQUEZ, THOMAS) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 6024 1/2 FOSTORIA ST, BELL GARDENS, CA 90201 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2009
  • NOTICE/LETTER RE: /D01 RETURNED AS TO (MARQUEZ, THOMAS) DUE TO VACANT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2009
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (MARQUEZ, THOMAS) , (MARQUEZ, RITA) , AND AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP, DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP , MEMO OF COSTS, IN THE SUM OF $ 0.00 , AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2009
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (MENDOZA, JULIO) FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST TO DEFAULT UNKNOW OCCUPANTS AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT:// REQUEST IS PREMATURE. UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS CANNOT BE DEFAULTED PRIOR TO 10/14/09. SUBMITTED ON 10/14/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2009
  • NOTICE/LETTER RE: UNLAWFUL DETAINER RETURNED AS TO (MARQUEZ, RITA) DUE TO ATTEMTED NOT KNOWN .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2009
  • NOTICE/LETTER RE: UNLAWFUL DETAINER RETURNED AS TO (MARQUEZ, RITA) DUE TO ATTEMPTED NOT KNOWN .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2009
  • NOTICE/LETTER RE: UNLAWFUL DETAINER RETURNED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS DUE TO ATTEMPTED NOT KNOWN .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED. SERVED AS TO (MARQUEZ, THOMAS) , (MARQUEZ, RITA) AND AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2009
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (MARQUEZ, THOMAS) , (MARQUEZ, RITA) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2009
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2009
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN HPK538978019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2009
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 11/09/09 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 002 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SKLAN JEFFREY F.