This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2016 at 09:37:41 (UTC).

MEJIA, ENRIQUE VS CLASSIC DISTRIBUTING & BEVERAGE

Case Summary

On 06/24/2009 MEJIA, ENRIQUE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CLASSIC DISTRIBUTING BEVERAGE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2633

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEJIA ENRIQUE

Defendants

CLASSIC DISTRIBUTING

RAMIREZ LESTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GERARD A FIERRO & ASSOCIATES APLC

Defendant Attorneys

LAW FIRM OF GOATES & MCCARTHY

MOORE & ASSOCIATES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2019
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT(INCORRECT NAME)/ORDER FILED/SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2011
  • CASE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO G C 68152 D(1) & D(2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2010
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2010
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE-ENTIRE ACTION, FILED & ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2010
  • FIRST STATEMENT OF AGREEMENT/ NONAGREEMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2010
  • JURY FEE DEPOSIT RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2010
  • NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2010
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2010
  • NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF MEDIATOR FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2010
  • NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/18/2009
  • CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW/CONFERENCE MINUTE ORDER ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2009
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2009
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2009
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED FOR INCORRECT NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2009
  • RECEIVED AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT(INCORRECT NAME)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2009
  • NON-APP CASE MGMT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 12/11/09, IN DEPT 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2009
  • CMR CLERK'S CERT OF SERVICE MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2009
  • COMPLAINT FILED - MOTOR VEHICLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLASSIC DISTRIBUTING COMPANY is a litigant