This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/27/2016 at 04:22:52 (UTC).

MCDRAGS INVESTMENTS LLC VS GONZALES, JOSE A.

Case Summary

On 12/21/2010 MCDRAGS INVESTMENTS LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GONZALES, JOSE A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3509

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCDRAGS INVESTMENTS LLC

Defendant

GONZALES JOSE A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCDANIEL, JAMES EDWARD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2013
  • CASE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODES 68151 & 68152.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2011
  • WRIT RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2011
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED AND ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2011
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2011
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2011
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2011
  • DEFAULT ENTERED FOR ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2011
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2011
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2011
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND NOT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2011
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PREJUDGMENT CLAIM ON ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2010
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2010
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2010
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2010
  • A/C - ATTORNEY UPDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MCDRAGS INVESTMENTS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McDaniel, James E.