This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/27/2016 at 06:46:36 (UTC).

MCDRAGS INVESTMENTS LLC VS ESCALANTE, JUAN

Case Summary

On 04/29/2011 MCDRAGS INVESTMENTS LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ESCALANTE, JUAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1126

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCDRAGS INVESTMENTS LLC

Defendants

ZELAYA RITA

ZELAYA WALTER

ZELAYA COSME

ZELAYA RANDY

ESCALANTE JUAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCDANIEL, JAMES EDWARD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2015
  • CASE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GC 68152 D(1)/GC 68152 D(2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2011
  • STATUS CONFERENCE HELD, MINUTE ORDER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2011
  • ORDER OF DISMISSAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2011
  • OSC CONTINUED TO 10/07/11 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPT F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2011
  • OSC SET 08/31/11, 0830 AM, DEPT. CHA, RM 1200 NOTICE FILED & MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2011
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2011
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2011
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MCDRAGS INVESTMENTS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McDaniel, James E.