This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/23/2016 at 01:32:37 (UTC).

MC2 WHOLESALE LIGHTING & ELECT VS. SUCCA, CHARLES

Case Summary

On 04/17/2009 MC2 WHOLESALE LIGHTING ELECT filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SUCCA, CHARLES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD A. STONE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1566

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Beverly Hills Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD A. STONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MC2 WHOLESALE LIGHTING & ELECTRICAL SUPPLIES INC. A CALIFORNIA CO

Defendants

SUCCA CHARLES AKA SUCCA CHUCK INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA CKS ELECTRIC HISSO

NATHANSON DIANA L. AN INDIVIDUAL

TUGGEY DAVE INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA DAVE TUGGEY CONSTRUCTION HIS SOLE PR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION - STEVEN L FELMAN

Attorney at A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 12/28/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2009
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2009
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED AS TO (TUGGEY, DAVE) INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA (DAVE TUGGEY CONSTRUCTION) HIS SOLE PROPRIETORSHIP , (NATHANSON, DIANA L.) AN INDIVIDUAL ONLY .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; ADR PACKAGE; NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT FILED. SERVED AS TO (SUCCA, CHARLES) AKA (SUCCA, CHUCK) INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA (CKS ELECTRIC) HIS SOLE PROPRIETORSHIP . COSTS OF $ 119.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; ADR PACKAGE; NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT FILED. SERVED AS TO (TUGGEY, DAVE) INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA (DAVE TUGGEY CONSTRUCTION) HIS SOLE PROPRIETORSHIP . COSTS OF $ 59.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2009
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN BH016331009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 006 OF HONORABLE RICHARD A. STONE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2009
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 08/17/09 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 006 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 04/17/09

    Read MoreRead Less