This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2018 at 19:13:48 (UTC).

M.B.E., INC. VS P.I.C. TEBYANI

Case Summary

On 10/26/2009 M B E , INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against P I C TEBYANI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LESLIE E. BROWN and BOBBI TILLMON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2032

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LESLIE E. BROWN

BOBBI TILLMON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

M. B. E. INC.

Defendants

KASSABIAN DEVELOPMENTS INC. C/O DIKRAN KASSABIAN AGENT FOR SERVICE

P. I. C. TEBYANI C/O ABDOLSHOGHI TEBYANI AGENT FOR SERVICE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2013
  • Docket* EFFECTIVE 05/20/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2013
  • Docket* CASE REASSIGNED TO THE INGLEWOOD COURTHOUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2013
  • Docket* CASE RENUMBERED FROM BH 09S02032 TO ING09SB2032

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2010
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2010
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESTRUCTION OF EXHIBITS FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL RE: EXHIBIT . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2010
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 10:00A M, IN DEPT. 006 , HON. JUDGE LESLIE E. BROWN PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL TRIAL DE NOVO. APPELLANT APPEARING . RESPONDENT APPEARING.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2010
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION AFTER APPEAL AND TRIAL DE NOVO ON 03/15/10 . THE COURT ORDERS THAT THE PLANTIFF(S)/RESPONDENT(S) SHALL HAVE AND RECOVER NOTHING BY THIS ACTION, AND THAT THE DEFENDANT(S)/APPELLANT(S) SHALL HAVE JUDGMENT FOR COSTS IN THE SUPERIOR COURT IN THE SUM OF $ 00.00 . A NON-BINDING ORDER WAS ISSUED DIRECTING ADAM ALEXANDER TO 1. RETURN THE CIRCULAR DRIVEWAY CALLBOX WITH KEYPAD AND CRESTRON CONTROLLER. 2. PEDESTRIAN CALLBOX WITH KEYPAD AND CRESTRON CONTROLLER TO M.B.E., INC. BY 03/19/10;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL DE NOVO ON APPEAL MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2010
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2010
  • DocketAFTER SUBMISSION, COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: ON JANUARY 4, 2010, THE COURT TOOK ITS DECISION UNDER SUBMISSION. EVIDENCE WAS PRESENTED, BOTH ORAL AND . DOCUMENTARY. THE COURT MAKES FINDINGS AND RULES AS FOLLOWS: JUDGMENT IS ORDERED IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF AND AGAINST DEFENDANT P.I.C. REBYANI AKA PACIFIC INDUSTRIAL AND CONSTRUCTUIN COMPANY IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,640.00; JUDGMENT IS ORDERED IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF AND AGAINST DEFENDANT KASSABIAN DEVELOPMENT INC, IN THE AMOUNT OF $5000.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2010
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 01/06/10 . FOR (M.B.E., INC.) . AGAINST (P.I.C. TEBYANI) C/O ABDOLSHOGHI TEBYANI, AGENT FOR SERVICE , D02 . PRINCIPAL $ 6640.00 . COSTS $ 89.00 . TOTAL $ 6729.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS. JUDGMENT OF $1,640.00 AGAINST DEFENDANT P.I.C. TEBYANI AKA PACIFIC INDUSTRIAL AND CONSTRUCTION COMPANY JUDGMENT OF $5000.00 AGAINST DEFENDNAT KASSABIAN DEVELOPMENT INC. EACH DEFENDANT TO BEAR 1/2 THE COST OF FEES OF $89.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2010
  • DocketAUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (M.B.E., INC.) . ALI NESHAT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2010
  • DocketAUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (P.I.C. TEBYANI) C/O ABDOLSHOGHI TEBYANI, AGENT FOR SERVICE . CONNIE TEBYANI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2010
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 005 , HON. BOBBI TILLMON PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . DEFENDANT APPEARING .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2010
  • DocketCOURT TAKES MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2010
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPT 5 -CHAMBERS RE: SUBMITTED MATTER .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2009
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPT. 005 RE: SMALL CLAIMS MATTER SCHEDULED FOR 01/04/10 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2009
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # BH458341002 . HEARING SET FOR 01/04/10 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 005

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2009
  • DocketFICTITIOUS BUSINESS NAME DECLARATION FILED. M.B.E., INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less