This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/17/2016 at 15:42:56 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS. STOKEY, SKIP S.

Case Summary

On 08/22/2008 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against STOKEY, SKIP S. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL P. VICENCIA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3406

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL P. VICENCIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

STOKEY SKIP S.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NELSON AND KENNARD - ROBERT SCOTT KENNARD

Attorney at NELSON AND KENNARD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/06/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE NORWALK COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM SBA08C03406 TO NOR08CT3406

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2013
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY WHOLLY UNSATISFIED. COSTS $ 70.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2011
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 1255.12 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2011
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ON BEHALF OF (LVNV FUNDING LLC) , RECEIPT NO. PAID . V/MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2008
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. RECEIPT # PAID .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2008
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK FOR DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO (STOKEY, SKIP S.) ON 11/17/08 FILED. DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 240.00 , AND DECLARATON OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2008
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2008
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 11/17/08 . FOR (LVNV FUNDING LLC) . AGAINST (STOKEY, SKIP S.) . PRINCIPAL $ 3393.86 . ATTORNEY FEES $ 0.00 . INTEREST $ 611.80 . COSTS $ 240.00 . TOTAL $ 4,245.66 .

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2008
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2008
  • DECLARATION RE: SEC. 1033 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2008
  • DECLARATION RE: COMPUTATION OF INTEREST FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2008
  • DECLARATION RE: SEC. 1033 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2008
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO DOES / ROES 1 TO 10 , [INCLUSIVE] ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED AS TO (STOKEY, SKIP S.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN SBA285720023.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY JUDGE MICHAEL P. VICENCIA TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 02/25/09 AT 01:30P M., IN DEPT. 001 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.