This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/08/2016 at 05:31:35 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING, LLC VS. CONRAD, ANNE

Case Summary

On 08/22/2008 LVNV FUNDING, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CONRAD, ANNE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Malibu Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAWRENCE MIRA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0194

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Malibu Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAWRENCE MIRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

CONRAD ANNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WOLPOFF & ABRAMSON, L.L.P. - LOURDES R SLINSKY

Attorney at WOLPOFF & ABRAMSON, L.L.P.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 01/27/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2008
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 001 , HON. LAWRENCE MIRA PRESIDING FOR HEARING ON OSC WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED. MATTER CONTINUED TO 12/22/08 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, DECLARATION, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM AND STATEMENT OF LOCATION FILED. SERVED AS TO (CONRAD, ANNE) . COSTS OF $ 60.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN MAL472300004.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY LAWRENCE MIRA TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 11/24/08 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 001 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 001 OF HONORABLE LAWRENCE MIRA .

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.