This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/21/2016 at 15:07:36 (UTC).

LUCERO, MARISSA VS. KERBER, JESSICA ANNE

Case Summary

On 01/21/2009 LUCERO, MARISSA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KERBER, JESSICA ANNE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse North located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JAMES LE BERT, MICHAEL DUGGAN, GARY PLATT, ANTY PETERS, MICAHEL DUGGAN, MICHAEL M DUGGAN and JOSH FREDRICKS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0130

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse North

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JAMES LE BERT

MICHAEL DUGGAN

GARY PLATT

ANTY PETERS

MICAHEL DUGGAN

MICHAEL M DUGGAN

JOSH FREDRICKS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LUCERO MARISSA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

PATEL DIPTI

KERBER JESSICA ANNE

Cross Defendant

KERBER JESSICA ANNE AKA CRAVEN JESSICA ANNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCOLINOS, SHELDON & NEVELL - TODD F. NEVELL ESQ

Attorney at SCOLINOS, SHELDON & NEVELL

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

RICHARDSON & FAIR - DEBORAH L. MCCLAIN

Attorney at RICHARDSON & FAIR

FORD, WALKER, HAGGERTY & BEHAR - PATRICK J. GIBBS ESQ

Attorney at FORD, WALKER, HAGGERTY & BEHAR

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

FORD, WALKER, HAGGERTY & BEHAR - PATRICK J. GIBBS ESQ

Attorney at FORD, WALKER, HAGGERTY & BEHAR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2013
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2013
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 03/21/13 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • CASE FILE RECEIVED FROM POMONA NORTH COURTHOUSE AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO WEST COVINA COURT HOUSE RE: RELOCATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2012
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2012
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (LUCERO, MARISSA) FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL. COURT DISMISSED CASE WITH PREJUDICE AS OF 02/23/12. PLEASE NOTE THAT MINUTE ORDER HAS ALREADY BEEN MAILED. SUBMITTED ON 01/25/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2012
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 10:53A M, IN DEPARTMENT 005 , HON. JOSH FREDRICKS PRESIDING FOR MOTION REGARDING DEFENDANT'S POST JUDGMENT MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AND PLAINTIFF'S FILING OF A SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT: : MOTION IS GRANTED. . BOTH SIDES STIPULATE TO THE FOLLOWING: THE CASE IS TO BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AND THE MOTION SET FOR THIS DATE IS OFF CALENDAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2012
  • COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2012
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO MICHELLE RE: REJECTING DISMISSALS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2012
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL RECEIVED AS TO (KERBER, JESSICA ANNE) .

    Read MoreRead Less
187 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 005 OF HONORABLE ANTHONY PETERS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2009
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 03/23/09 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 005 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 01/22/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2009
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN POM115119026.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2009
  • ANSWER FILED OF (KERBER, JESSICA ANNE) . RECEIPT # POM115119033 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2009
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY (KERBER, JESSICA ANNE) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2009
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED. CROSS-COMPLAINANT(S): (PATEL, DIPTI) . CROSS-DEFENDANT(S): (KERBER, JESSICA ANNE) AKA (CRAVEN, JESSICA ANNE) . RECEIPT # 0.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2009
  • ANSWER FILED OF (PATEL, DIPTI) . RECEIPT # POM408007006 .

    Read MoreRead Less