This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/26/2019 at 19:16:32 (UTC).

LERNER, BRUCE VS NISSAN WOODWORKS INC

Case Summary

On 03/12/2010 LERNER, BRUCE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NISSAN WOODWORKS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are IRVING SHIMER, MARLENE A. KRISTOVICH and ROBERT HARRISON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2743

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

IRVING SHIMER

MARLENE A. KRISTOVICH

ROBERT HARRISON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LERNER BRUCE

Defendant

NISSAN WOODWORKS INC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL DE NOVO ON APPEAL MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2011
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 090 , HON. ROBERT HARRISON, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: OSC RE SANCTIONS . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: CAUSE ORDERED TRANSFERRED TO DEPT. 80 (CASE IS ON APPEAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2011
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 09:30A M, IN DEPT. 080 , HON. IRVING SHIMER PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL TRIAL DE NOVO. APPELLANT APPEARING . RESPONDENT APPEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2011
  • DocketCOURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS THE COURT CONFIRMS THE ARBITRATION AWARD AND THE AWARD IS ENTERED AS THE JUDGMENT OF THE COURT :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2011
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION AFTER APPEAL AND TRIAL DE NOVO ON 04/28/11 . THE COURT ORDERS THAT THE PLANTIFF(S)/RESPONDENT(S) SHALL HAVE AND RECOVER NOTHING BY THIS ACTION, AND THAT THE DEFENDANT(S)/APPELLANT(S) SHALL HAVE JUDGMENT FOR COSTS IN THE SUPERIOR COURT IN THE SUM OF $ 0.00 . PER THE ARBITRATION AWARD, EACH SIDE SHALL BEAR ITS OWN COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2011
  • DocketMISC. DOCUMENTS RECEIVED FROM PLAINTIFF BRUCE LERNER FOR JUDGE TO READ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2011
  • DocketRECEIVED AWARD OF ARBTIRATIOR PER HON.BURTONS. KATZ,RET. ALTERNATIVE RESOLUTION CENTERS, LLC 1875 CENTURY PARK EAST SUITE 450 LOS ANGELES, CALIFORNIA 90067

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2011
  • DocketMATTER SET FOR COURT TRIAL ON 04/28/11 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 090 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2011
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2011
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 080 , HON. MARLENE A. KRISTOVICH PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 04/28/11 AT 09:30A M, IN DEPT. 080 .

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2010
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 090 , HON. ROBERT HARRISON, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . DEFENDANT APPEARING .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2010
  • DocketAUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (NISSAN WOODWORKS INC) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2010
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 06/25/10 . FOR (LERNER, BRUCE) . AGAINST (NISSAN WOODWORKS INC) . PRINCIPAL $ 950.00 . COSTS $ 105.00 . TOTAL $ 1055.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS. THE COURT FINDS THE DEFENDANT HAD A DUTY TO ADVISE PLAINTIFF ON CABINET CARE BUT PLAINTIFF FAILED TO AVOID FURTHER DAMAGES AFTER FIRST DETECTING THE PROBLEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT AND DECLARATION FILED BY (NISSAN WOODWORKS INC) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 06/28/10 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 090 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO ALL PARTIES. RECEIPT # LAC405190013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT AND DECLARATION FILED BY (NISSAN WOODWORKS INC) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 06/25/10 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 090 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO ALL PARTIES. RECEIPT # LAC405190013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (NISSAN WOODWORKS INC) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2010
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 090 , HON. ROBERT HARRISON, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2010
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 05/03/10 . FOR (LERNER, BRUCE) . AGAINST (NISSAN WOODWORKS INC) . PRINCIPAL $ 5880.00 . COSTS $ 105.00 . TOTAL $ 5985.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2010
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED BY SHERIFF. SERVED AS TO (NISSAN WOODWORKS INC) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 05/03/10 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 090 . COSTS OF $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2010
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN LAC277592001. HEARING SET FOR 05/03/10 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. 090.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NISSAN WOODWORKS LLC is a litigant