This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/25/2016 at 04:47:27 (UTC).

LEMOLI AVENUE H.O.A. VS ABBY, SHEILA D

Case Summary

On 01/10/2011 LEMOLI AVENUE H O A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ABBY, SHEILA D. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ARNOLD KESSLER and DOUGLAS G. CARNAHAN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0046

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ARNOLD KESSLER

DOUGLAS G. CARNAHAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEMOLI AVENUE H. O. A.

Defendant

ABBY SHEILA D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2013
  • Docket* EFFECTIVE 05/28/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • Docket* CASE REASSIGNED TO THE INGLEWOOD COURTHOUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • Docket* CASE RENUMBERED FROM SBA11S00046 TO ING11ST0046

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2011
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY WHOLLY SATISFIED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2011
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. VIA CHRIS . RECEIPT # PAID .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2011
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPT. 008 RE: ON CALENDAR 7-20-11 PM .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2011
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 008 , HON. ARNOLD KESSLER, JUDGE PRO TEM PRESIDING FOR EXAM. OF JGMT DEBTOR. JGMT CREDITOR APPEARING IN PRO PER . JUDGMENT DEBTOR (ABBY, SHEILA D) SWORN, EXAMINED, AND DISCHARGED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2011
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2011
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2011
  • DocketSUBPOENA DUCES TECUM AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED. SERVED AS NAMED AS TO (ABBY, SHEILA D) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2011
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2011
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 008 , HON. DOUGLAS G. CARNAHAN, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 03/02/11 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 008 . PLAINTIFF AMENDS CLAIM TO STATE $1690.00. DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR A CONTINUANCE BASED ON POOR SERVICE IS GRANTED. DEFENDANT IS SERVED IN COURT WITH THE AMENDED CLAIM. CLERK HEREBY GIVES NOTICE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2011
  • DocketPROCEEDINGS ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED. INDEX NUMBER CD 02/15/11 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2011
  • DocketAUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (LEMOLI AVENUE H.O.A.) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2011
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2011
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2011
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO 008 RE: CALENDAR 02/15/11 AT 1:30 P.M. .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2011
  • DocketCERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT FILED. SERVED AS TO (ABBY, SHEILA D) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 02/15/11 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 008 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2011
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN 1110110E5030. HEARING SET FOR 02/15/11 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. 008.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2011
  • DocketCOPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FOR SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL ELECTRONICALLY REQUESTED FOR DEFENDANT(S) (ABBY, SHEILA D)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEMOLI AVENUE HOMEWONERS ASSOCIATION is a litigant