This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2016 at 21:15:58 (UTC).

LEBOVIC, DEVORAH VS. ROBIN, REUBEN S.

Case Summary

On 03/03/2009 LEBOVIC, DEVORAH filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ROBIN, REUBEN S. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CAROL J. HALLOWITZ. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0440

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Beverly Hills Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CAROL J. HALLOWITZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LEBOVIC DEVORAH

THE ROBIN INVESTMENT GROUP INC.

Defendants

ROBIN REUBEN S.

THE ROBIN GROUP LLC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 03/07/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2009
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 004 , HON. CAROL J. HALLOWITZ. COMM'R PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2009
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2009
  • LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE RE: PLAINTIFF'S ATTENTION THAT 05/29/09 IS A JEWISH HOLIDAY (SHAVOUT) AND KNOWS THAT THE DEFENDANT WILL NOT APPEAR. RECEIVED FROM (LEBOVIC, DEVORAH) AND PLACED INTO CASE FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2009
  • REQUEST RE: DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF THE COURT DATE OF 05/29/09. RECEIVED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2009
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT 004. RE: DEFENDANT'S 'UNTIMELY' REQUEST TO POSTPONE THE COURT DATE OF 05/29/09. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2009
  • LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE RE: MAY 29,2009 IS A JEWISH HOLIDAY RECEIVED FROM (LEBOVIC, DEVORAH) AND PLACED INTO CASE FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2009
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT 004. RE: SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 05/29/09 AT 1:30 P.M. IN DEPARTMENT 004. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2009
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPT. 004 FOR CONSIDERATION TO POSTPONE FOR THE 2ND TIME (DEFENDANT), GIVEN TO NORA FOR DIV 004 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2009
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE/P0STPONEMENT OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING IS DENIED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON{S}: DEFENDANT WAS PREVIOUSLY GRANTED A CONTINUANCE, NO GOOD CAUSE 052009 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2009
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE/POSTPONEMENT OF (ROBIN, REUBEN S.) IS GRANTED. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIM HEARING ON 05/29/09 AT 01:30P M. IN DEPT. 004 , CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (THE ROBIN GROUP LLC) . COSTS OF $ 30.00 . DELIVERING TO REUBEN S. ROBIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (ROBIN, REUBEN S.) . COSTS OF $ 30.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2009
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # BH246938001 . HEARING SET FOR 04/24/09 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 004

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE ROBIN GROUP LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Robin Investment Group, Inc. is a litigant