This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/25/2016 at 22:09:10 (UTC).

LASALLE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIAT VS. JENKINS, BENSON

Case Summary

On 08/22/2008 LASALLE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIAT filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JENKINS, BENSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2749

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LASALLE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR FIRST FRANKLIN MORTGAGE

Defendant

JENKINS BENSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PITE DUNCAN, LLP - DANIEL R. GAMEZ

Attorney at PITE DUNCAN, LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2010
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2010
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 02/11/10 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2009
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 125.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2008
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2008
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 11/19/08 , FOR (LASALLE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION) AS TRUSTEE FOR (FIRST FRANKLIN MORTGAGE) , AGAINST (JENKINS, BENSON) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 1125 ENCANTADORA LANE, LANCASTER, CA 93535 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2008
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 30.00 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2008
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # PD . SHERIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLIANT FILED. SERVED AS TO (JENKINS, BENSON) . COSTS OF $ 113.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2008
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (JENKINS, BENSON) , & ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2008
  • ORDER GRANTING SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY POSTING AND MAILING SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2008
  • APPLICATION/DECLARATION FOR ORDER GRANTING SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT BY POSTING & MAILING (CCP 415.45) FILED. RN PD .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2008
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN 039.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.