This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/25/2016 at 07:24:05 (UTC).

LASALLE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIAT VS. BUENO, GABRIELA

Case Summary

On 03/05/2008 LASALLE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIAT filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BUENO, GABRIELA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Clarita Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0299

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Clarita Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LASALLE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE

Defendant

BUENO GABRIELA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TFLG, A LAW CORPORATION - DAVID R. ENDRES ESQ

Attorney at TFLG, A LAW CORPORATION

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2009
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2009
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 08/28/09 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2008
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 125.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2008
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2008
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 07/14/08 , FOR (LASALLE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION) AS TRUSTEE , AGAINST (BUENO, GABRIELA) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 17941 BENEDA LANE, SANTA CLARITA, CA 91351 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2008
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE: EXHIBITS/ DEPOSITION ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED AND MAILED TO PLAINTIFF .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2008
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 30.00 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2008
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # NEW253967001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS UNLAWFUL DETAINER, COMPLAINT UNLAWFUL DETAINER, PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED. SERVED AS TO (BUENO, GABRIELA) , ALL OCCUPANTS . COSTS OF $ 124.21 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2008
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (BUENO, GABRIELA) , ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED. REQUEST FOR CLERK'S JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2008
  • APPLICATION/DECLARATION AND ORDER ALLOWING SERVICE BY POSTING AND MAILING FOR GABRIELA BUENO, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO DIV. 003 FOR CONSIDERATION. RN NEW253967006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2008
  • ORDER GRANTING SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY POSTING AND MAILING SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2008
  • NOTICE/LETTER RE: NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER RETURNED AS TO (BUENO, GABRIELA) DUE TO RETURN TO SENDER, NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2008
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2008
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN NEW240853073.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2008
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2008
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less