This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/19/2016 at 20:57:35 (UTC).

LAND SPAN INC VS ESSENTIAL FREIGHT CALIFORNIA

Case Summary

On 03/01/2011 LAND SPAN INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ESSENTIAL FREIGHT CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3857

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAND SPAN INC

Defendant

ESSENTIAL FREIGHT CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOLLINS LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2012
  • CASE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO G C 68152 D(1) & D(2)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2011
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2011
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE-ENTIRE ACTION, FILED & ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE /FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL/FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2011
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2011
  • OSC SET 09/02/11, 0830 AM, DEPT. 77, NOTICE FILED & MAILED * * DELETED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2011
  • COMPLAINT FILED - COLLECTION CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2011
  • SUMMONS FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ESSENTIAL FREIGHT CALIFORNIA INC is a litigant