Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/09/2016 at 07:45:45 (UTC).

LABOR COMMISSIONER, STATE OF VS. PACHECO TIRE, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/28/2011 LABOR COMMISSIONER, STATE OF filed a Labor - Wage Claim lawsuit against PACHECO TIRE, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3367

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wage Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LABOR COMMISSIONER STATE OF CALIFORNIA CH

Defendant

PACHECO TIRE INC. DBA PACHECO'S TIRE SERVICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - JAMES E. BERRY

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/13/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE STANLEY MOSK COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM COM11C03367 TO LAM11CC3367

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • NOTICE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2012
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. RECEIPT # GC6103 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2011
  • CLERK`S NOTICE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • ORDER AWARD OR DECISION OF THE LABOR COMMISSIONER FILED. RN 6103.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • STATE CASE NUMBER: 35-101029

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 10/28/11 . FOR (LABOR COMMISSIONER, STATE OF CALIFORNIA) CHIEF OF THE DIVISION OF LABOR STANDARDS ENFORCEMENT DEPARTMENT OF INDUSTRIAL RELATIONS . AGAINST (PACHECO TIRE, INC.) DBA (PACHECO'S TIRE SERVICE) . PRINCIPAL $ 9000.00 . ATTORNEY FEES $ 0.00 . INTEREST $ 0.00 . COSTS $ 0.00 . TOTAL $ 9,000.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less