This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/24/2016 at 09:47:15 (UTC).

LA FAMILY MAGAZINES, LLC VS. ADLOO, MOHAMMAD EBRAHIM

Case Summary

On 08/10/2009 LA FAMILY MAGAZINES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ADLOO, MOHAMMAD EBRAHIM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BOBBI TILLMON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3156

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BOBBI TILLMON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LA FAMILY MAGAZINES LLC

Defendants

GRANITE TRANSFORMATIONS WEST LOS ANGELES INC.

ADLOO MOHAMMAD EBRAHIM AKA ADLOO EBARHIM AKA ADLOO EBIE INDIVIDUALLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF MARTIN F. GOLDMAN - JOHN JAMES CHOW

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MARTIN F. GOLDMAN

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF HUNG BAN TRAN - KEVIN K CHIU

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF HUNG BAN TRAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 12/26/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2010
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 005 , HON. BOBBI TILLMON PRESIDING FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2010
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2010
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2010
  • NOTICE OF HEARING RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SIGNED AND FILED BY BOBBI TILLMON . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/14/10 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 005 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2010
  • NOTICE OF UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2009
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 03/03/10 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 005 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 12/28/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2009
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2009
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (LA FAMILY MAGAZINES, LLC) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2009
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (ADLOO, MOHAMMAD EBRAHIM) AKA (ADLOO, EBARHIM) AKA (ADLOO, EBIE) INDIVIDUALLY .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2009
  • ANSWER RECEIVED AS TO (ADLOO, MOHAMMAD EBRAHIM) AKA (ADLOO, EBARHIM) AKA (ADLOO, EBIE) INDIVIDUALLY , (GRANITE TRANSFORMATIONS WEST LOS ANGELES, INC.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2009
  • ANSWER FILED OF (ADLOO, MOHAMMAD EBRAHIM) AKA (ADLOO, EBARHIM) AKA (ADLOO, EBIE) INDIVIDUALLY , (GRANITE TRANSFORMATIONS WEST LOS ANGELES, INC.) . RECEIPT # BH538847029 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; ADR PACKAGE; NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT FILED. SERVED AS TO (GRANITE TRANSFORMATIONS WEST LOS ANGELES, INC.) SERVED NAZ OAKLEY . COSTS OF $ 20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; ADR PACKAGE; NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT FILED. SERVED AS TO (ADLOO, MOHAMMAD EBRAHIM) AKA (ADLOO, EBARHIM) AKA (ADLOO, EBIE) INDIVIDUALLY SERVED NAZ OAKLEY . COSTS OF $ 37.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2009
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN BH053884003.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 005 OF HONORABLE BOBBI TILLMON .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2009
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 12/08/09 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 005 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 08/12/09

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LA FAMILY MAGAZINE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHIU KEVIN KIN