Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/29/2016 at 13:31:12 (UTC).

KRISEL, RON VS. JOSEPH, SANDRA

Case Summary

On 06/19/2009 KRISEL, RON filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JOSEPH, SANDRA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD A. STONE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0607

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Beverly Hills Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD A. STONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KRISEL RON

Defendants

LOMBARDI LOUIS E. PREJUDGMENT CLAIMANT

JOSEPH SANDRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - DUANE HALL

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Defendant Attorneys

ANKER, REED, HYMES, SCHREIBER & COHEN - KC MARIE KNOX

Attorney at ANKER, REED, HYMES, SCHREIBER & COHEN

ROBERT A.COHEN - ROBERT A COHEN ESQ

Attorney at ROBERT A.COHEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2013
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 01/16/13 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2009
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 09:00A M, IN DEPT. 006 , HON. JUDGE RICHARD A. STONE PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. PLAINTIFF(S) APPEARING BY DUANE HALL . DEFENDANT(S) APPEARING BY ROBERT A. COHEN .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2009
  • JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION ORDERED ENTERED FOR THE PLAINTIFF AND AGAINST DEFENDANTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2009
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 08/14/09 , FOR (KRISEL, RON) , AGAINST (JOSEPH, SANDRA) , (LOMBARDI, LOUIS E.) PREJUDGMENT CLAIMANT , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 8336 DELONGPRE, W. HOLLYWOOD, CA 90069 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46. NO FINAL LOCKOUT PRIOR TO 09/01/09;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2009
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE: EXHIBITS/ DEPOSITION ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2009
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO 006 RE: CT 08/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2009
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL ON 08/14/09 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2009
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2009
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK FOR DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO CCP 415.46 ON 07/08/09 FILED. DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 0.00 , AND DECLARATON OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2009
  • NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED PROOFS OF SERVICES [FOR MOTION TO QUASH; PROPOSED ORDER; DECLARATION; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM] FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2009
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO LAW CLERK RE: MOTION 7/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2009
  • PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED BY CLAIMANT (LOMBARDI, LOUIS E.) PREJUDGMENT CLAIMANT . . RECEIPT # BH490068005 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 07/01/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2009
  • NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF (JOSEPH, SANDRA) , (LOMBARDI, LOUIS E.) PREJUDGMENT CLAIMANT TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS (UNLAWFUL DETAINER); TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITH P & A'S FILED. RN BH490068005 . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 07/14/09 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2009
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2009
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN BH490068044.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 006 OF HONORABLE RICHARD A. STONE .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HALL, DUANE