This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/13/2016 at 11:21:44 (UTC).

KRETZSCHMAR, ILENE K. VS. MATHIAS, GLENN

Case Summary

On 02/22/2006 KRETZSCHMAR, ILENE K filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MATHIAS, GLENN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Malibu Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0039

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Malibu Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KRETZSCHMAR INGO

KRETZSCHMAR ILENE K.

Defendant

MATHIAS GLENN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2009
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2009
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 06/29/09 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2006
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S). CLAIM OF DEFENDANT DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. PAPER IS SIGNED BY ALL LITIGANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2006
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE/POSTPONEMENT OF (KRETZSCHMAR, ILENE K.) IS GRANTED. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIM HEARING ON 08/28/06 AT 10:00A M. IN DIV. 003 , CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2006
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE/POSTPONEMENT OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING RECEIVED FROM (KRETZSCHMAR, ILENE K.) . CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DIV. 003 FOR CONSIDERATION . RECEIPT # MAL136401007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2006
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT FILED. SERVED AS TO (KRETZSCHMAR, ILENE K.) . DATE OF DELIVERY: 04/06/2006.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2006
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT FILED. SIGNED BY (KRETZSCHMAR, ILENE K.) ON BEHALF OF (KRETZSCHMAR, INGO) . DATE OF DELIVERY: 04/06/2006.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2006
  • COPY OF DEFENDANT'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO PLAINTIFF(S) (KRETZSCHMAR, ILENE K.) . RECEIPT # MAL510618005 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2006
  • COPY OF DEFENDANT'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO PLAINTIFF(S) (KRETZSCHMAR, INGO) . RECEIPT # MAL510618005 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2006
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE/POSTPONEMENT OF (MATHIAS, GLENN) IS GRANTED. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIM HEARING ON 06/29/06 AT 10:00A M. IN DIV. 003 , CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2006
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE/POSTPONEMENT OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING RECEIVED FROM (MATHIAS, GLENN) . CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DIV. 003 FOR CONSIDERATION . RECEIPT # MAL510618004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2006
  • DEFENDANT'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FILED BY (MATHIAS, GLENN) . RECEIPT # MAL510618004 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2006
  • COPY OF DEFENDANT'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO PLAINTIFF(S) (KRETZSCHMAR, ILENE K.) , (KRETZSCHMAR, INGO) . RECEIPT # MAL510618005 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2006
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN MAL136401005. HEARING SET FOR 04/10/06 AT 10:00 AM IN DIV. 003.

    Read MoreRead Less