Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2016 at 17:20:20 (UTC).

KNOTT, ERNIE C. VS. BEST CUSTOM GARAGE COATINGS, I

Case Summary

On 05/01/2009 KNOTT, ERNIE C filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BEST CUSTOM GARAGE COATINGS, I. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Huntington Park Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANA MARIA LUNA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1215

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Huntington Park Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANA MARIA LUNA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KNOTT ERNIE C. AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendants

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK LTD A CONNECTICUT CORP.

BEST CUSTOM GARAGE COATINGS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF RICE & ROTHENBERG - MARC S. ROTHENBERG

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF RICE & ROTHENBERG

Defendant Attorney

/ - JOHN M. HUGHES II

Attorney at /

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 04/04/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2010
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2010
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 08/02/10 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 002 . THE PLAINTIFF FAX FILED A NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, MSC FOR 7-6 AND TRIAL FOR 7-12-2010 IS VACATED. OSC RE: DISMISSAL IS SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2010
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2010
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2010
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT RE: UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED BY (KNOTT, ERNIE C.), AN INDIVIDUAL .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2010
  • ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT SIGNED BY JAIME R. CORRAL AND FILED. THE MSC SET FOR 7-6-2010 IS VACATED. THE TRIAL SET FOR 7-12-2010 IS VACATED. THE MATTER IS SET FOR AN OSC RE: DISMISSAL FOR 8-2-2010. CLERK TO GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2010
  • MATTER SET FOR COURT TRIAL ON 07/12/10 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 002 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2010
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 05/27/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW FILED. SERVED AS TO (AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK), LTD, A CONNECTICUT CORP. . COSTS OF $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2009
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (KNOTT, ERNIE C.), AN INDIVIDUAL FOR REJECTION OF PROOF OF SERVICE: IF MARGARET WILSON IS THE AGENT FOR SERVICE, AND SHE WAS SERVED, THE PROOF OF SERVICE WOULD BE PERSONAL SERVICE, NOT SUBSTITUTE SERVICE. PLEASE CORRECT AND RESUBMIT. //THANK YOU SUBMITTED ON 05/21/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW FILED. SERVED AS TO (BEST CUSTOM GARAGE COATINGS, INC.), A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION . COSTS OF $ 70.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2009
  • DECLARATION OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2009
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (KNOTT, ERNIE C.), AN INDIVIDUAL FOR REJECTION OF PROOF OF SERVICE: DEFENDANT'S NAME NEEDS TO BE STATED IN SECTION 3A. ALSO ON DEFENDANT #2, YOU MUST STATE THE NAME OF THE PERSON AUTHORIZED FOR SERVICE, ANOTHER CO./CORP CANNOT BE STATED. PLEASE CORRECT AND RESUBMIT.// THANK YOU SUBMITTED ON 05/13/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2009
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN HPK542830002.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2009
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 10/08/09 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. CLK . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 05/01/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. CLK OF HONORABLE ANA MARIA LUNA .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB, A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer J Michael Hughes