This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2018 at 15:30:55 (UTC).

KLEEMAN, ANNETTE W VS AIR AL INC.

Case Summary

On 06/04/2009 KLEEMAN, ANNETTE W filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AIR AL INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HERBERT DODELL and LAWRENCE CHO. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1640

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HERBERT DODELL

LAWRENCE CHO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KLEEMAN ANNETTE W

Defendant

AIR AL INC.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/28/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE INGLEWOOD COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM SM 09A01640 TO ING09SS1640

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2009
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2009
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 08/11/09 . FOR (KLEEMAN, ANNETTE W) . AGAINST (AIR AL INC.) . PRINCIPAL $ 3960.00 . COSTS $ 60.00 . TOTAL $ 4020.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2009
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2009
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. WEQ , HON. HERBERT DODELL, PRO TEM PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING IN PRO PER . DEFENDANT APPEARING . MATTER TRANSFERRED TO DEPARTMENT WE S PURSUANT TO CONGESTED CALENDAR OF WE Q.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2009
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (AIR AL INC.) . GIDEON ELJAHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2009
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. WES , HON. LAWRENCE CHO PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING IN PRO PER . DEFENDANT APPEARING BY: GIDEON ELJAHN .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2009
  • MATTER RE-SCHEDULED FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 08/11/09 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. WEQ .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2009
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN 1090605E2612. HEARING SET FOR 07/21/09 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. WEQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AIR AL INC C/O GIDEON ELLYAHU CE is a litigant