This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/09/2016 at 09:58:27 (UTC).

KIM, JENNIFER VS. RICE, ERIN CHEYENNE

Case Summary

On 01/10/2008 KIM, JENNIFER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RICE, ERIN CHEYENNE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PAMELA A. DAVIS, ALLAN J. GOODMAN and R. CANNON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0024

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Los Angeles Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

PAMELA A. DAVIS

ALLAN J. GOODMAN

R. CANNON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KIM JENNIFER DR

Defendants

RICE LINDA R/

RICE ERIN CHEYENNE DR

RICE KURT R/

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2010
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2010
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 11/10/10 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2008
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM WE-S/SANTA MONICA COURT TO WEST LOS ANGELES COURT, VIA COUNTY MESSENGER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. WES , HON. PAMELA A. DAVIS PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL TRIAL DE NOVO. APPELLANT APPEARING BY PERRY M. FORRESTER . RESPONDENT APPEARING. IN PRO PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2008
  • ORDER PURSUANT TO STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT AGAINST (RICE, ERIN CHEYENNE) DRIVER , (RICE, KURT) R/O , (RICE, LINDA) R/O SIGNED AND FILED. A REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE IS SIGNED, FILED AND ENTERED THIS DATE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2008
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED AS TO (RICE, ERIN CHEYENNE) DRIVER , (RICE, KURT) R/O , (RICE, LINDA) R/O . FILED BY PLAINTIFF, AS TO ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2008
  • PURSUANT TO THE ORDER OF THE COURT, THE APPEAL IS DISMISSED, AND THE CASE IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2008
  • FILE FORWARDED TO SANTA MONICA COURT FOR TRIAL DE NOVO ON SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2008
  • NOTICE OF SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL TRIAL DE NOVO FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/21/08 , AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. WES OF THE LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT- SANTA MONICA . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2008
  • NOTICE OF SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL FILED BY (RICE, ERIN CHEYENNE) DRIVER . RECEIPT NUMBER LAWPAID . CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF APPEAL FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2008
  • COURT TAKES MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2008
  • AFTER SUBMISSION, COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2008
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 02/22/08 . FOR (KIM, JENNIFER) DRIVER & R/O . AGAINST (RICE, ERIN CHEYENNE) DRIVER , (RICE, KURT) R/O , (RICE, LINDA) R/O . PRINCIPAL $ 7500.00 . COSTS $ 135.00 . TOTAL $ 7635.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS. (PRINCIPAL JUDGMENT IS CALCULATED AS FOLLOWS: MEDICAL DAMAGES: $1,201.52; PROPERTY DAMAGES: $3,020.00; GENERAL DAMAGES: $3,278.48; TOTAL $7,500. PLUS COSTS.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2008
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (RICE, ERIN CHEYENNE) DRIVER , (RICE, KURT) R/O , (RICE, LINDA) R/O .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 , HON. R. CANNON JUDGE PRO TEM PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 02/22/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. WEH .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2008
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. WEH , HON. ALLAN J. GOODMAN PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING BY JENNIFER KIM . DEFENDANT APPEARING BY ERIN RICE, KURT RICE AND LINDA RICE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED BY SHERIFF. SERVED AS TO (RICE, LINDA) R/O . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 02/22/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 . COSTS OF $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED BY SHERIFF. SERVED AS TO (RICE, KURT) R/O . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 02/22/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 . COSTS OF $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2008
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN LAWPAID. HEARING SET FOR 02/22/08 AT 01:30 PM IN DIV. 092.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.