This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/21/2016 at 10:34:12 (UTC).

KIDS FROM THE VALLEY IV LLC VS TRI J SYSTEMS INC.

Case Summary

On 10/22/2007 KIDS FROM THE VALLEY IV LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against TRI J SYSTEMS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5043

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KIDS FROM THE VALLEY IV LLC

Defendant

TRI J SYSTEMS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KING, ALLEN R.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2009
  • ** CASE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GOVT CODE 68151 - 68153

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2008
  • WRIT RETURNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2007
  • DISMISSAL REJECT: CASE HAS ALREADY REACHED DISPOSITION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2007
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2007
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2007
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2007
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2007
  • MEMO TO SET REJECTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2007
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-30 MIN(S) * * REJECTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2007
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2007
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2007
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2007
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED AND ISSUED+

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2007
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2007
  • SUMMONS FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KIDS FROM THE VALLEY IV LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KING, ALLEN R.