This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/21/2016 at 08:29:31 (UTC).

KIDS FROM THE VALLEY IV LLC VS TRI J SYSTEMS INC.

Case Summary

On 08/27/2007 KIDS FROM THE VALLEY IV LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against TRI J SYSTEMS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3950

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KIDS FROM THE VALLEY IV LLC

Defendant

TRI J SYSTEMS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KING, ALLEN R.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2007
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2007
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2007
  • A/C - COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2007
  • MEMO TO SET REJECTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2007
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-30 MIN(S) * * REJECTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2007
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2007
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2007
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2007
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED AND ISSUED+

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2007
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2007
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2007
  • SUMMONS FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less