This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/30/2016 at 00:38:05 (UTC).

KIDS FROM THE VALLEY IV LLC VS EVANS-HILLIARD INC

Case Summary

On 11/18/2010 KIDS FROM THE VALLEY IV LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against EVANS-HILLIARD INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7234

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KIDS FROM THE VALLEY IV LLC

Defendants

EVANS-HILLIARD INC

HYDROLECTRIC POWER LLC

DATA RECOVERY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RESSER, BERNARD M.

Defendant Attorney

WEISSMAN, I. DONALD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2015
  • CASE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GC 68152 D(1)/GC 68152 D(2)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2012
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2011
  • PRE-TRIAL MINUTES-OFF CALENDAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2011
  • STIPULATION JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2011
  • WRITTEN STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT FILE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2011
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2011
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2011
  • PRE-TRIAL MINUTES-CONTD TO 04/21/11 AT 08:30 A M IN DEPT. NWP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2011
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL MAILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2011
  • NON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 04/04/11, 08:30 AM, DEPT NWP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2011
  • NOTICE OF RULING FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2011
  • MOTION RULING ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2011
  • RESPONSE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2011
  • MOTION FILED: MOT TO QUASH SVC OF SUMNS HEARING SET FOR 1/18/11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2010
  • ORDER TO POST SUMMONS REJECTED+

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2010
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2010
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER TO POST SUMMONS SUBMITTED+

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2010
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2010
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2010
  • SUMMONS FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less