This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/23/2016 at 07:58:16 (UTC).

KIDS FROM THE VALLEY IV LLC VS DEVIR, STEVEN

Case Summary

On 03/05/2008 KIDS FROM THE VALLEY IV LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against DEVIR, STEVEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1377

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KIDS FROM THE VALLEY IV LLC

Defendants

DEVIR STEVEN

REMOTE DEE VISION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KING, ALLEN R.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2010
  • **** CASE FILE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GOVT. CODE 68151-68153****

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2008
  • WRIT RETURNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2008
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2008
  • SUBMISSION FOR COURT JUDGMENT PENDING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2008
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2008
  • COURT JUDGMENT CANCELED+

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2008
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2008
  • SUBMISSION FOR COURT JUDGMENT PENDING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2008
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2008
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/03/2008
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER TO POST SUMMONS RESUBMITTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2008
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2008
  • ORDER TO POST SIGNED BY COMM M.J BLOCK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2008
  • ORDER TO POST SUMMONS REJECTED+

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2008
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER TO POST SUMMONS SUBMITTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2008
  • APPLIC AND ORDER TO POST SUBMITTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2008
  • ORDER TO POST REJECTED+

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2008
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2008
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2008
  • SUMMONS FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less