This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/26/2016 at 05:27:09 (UTC).

KIDS FROM THE VALLEY 1 LLC VS TSATURYAN, EDVIN

Case Summary

On 03/24/2009 KIDS FROM THE VALLEY 1 LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against TSATURYAN, EDVIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0909

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KIDS FROM THE VALLEY 1 LLC

Defendant

TSATURYAN EDVIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KING, ALLEN R.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2012
  • CASE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODES 68151 & 68152.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2009
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2009
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE-ENTIRE ACTION, FILED & ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2009
  • OSC CONTINUED TO 07/09/09 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPT F43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2009
  • OSC SET 06/03/09, 0830 AM, DEPT. CHA, RM 1200 NOTICE FILED & MAILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2009
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2009
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less