This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/23/2016 at 11:18:46 (UTC).

KHEYRI, MAHMOUD VS. CYRKIN, NINA

Case Summary

On 06/09/2009 KHEYRI, MAHMOUD filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CYRKIN, NINA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BOBBI TILLMON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2218

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Beverly Hills Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BOBBI TILLMON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KHEYRI MAHMOUD

Defendants

CYRKIN NINA INDIVIDUALLY AND ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS CYRKIN MI

CYRKIN NINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF MOGHADDAMI & SADIGH - JAMES K. SADIGH ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MOGHADDAMI & SADIGH

Defendant Attorney

EARLY, MASLACH & O'SHEA - DANIEL STEIN

Attorney at EARLY, MASLACH & O'SHEA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 12/21/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2010
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2010
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 09:00A M, IN DEPT. 005 , HON. ADMINISTRATIVELY HELD PRESIDING FOR PRE-TRIAL SETTLEMENT CONF. PLAINTIFF APPEARING JAMES K. SADIGH . DEFENDANT APPEARING DANIEL N. STEIN . NO SETTLEMENT REACHED. TRIAL DATE TO REMAIN ON CALENDAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2010
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPT 5 RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2010
  • CAUSE CALLED IN DEPT. 005 , HON. BOBBI TILLMON PRESIDING FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE/REVIEW: . COURT ORDERS MATTER CONTINUED/SET FOR JURY TRIAL ON 09/07/10 AT 10:00A M, IN DEPT. 005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2010
  • MATTER SET FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON 04/07/10 AT 09:00A M, IN DEPT. 005 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2010
  • MATTER SET FOR STATUS CONFERENCE ON 09/02/10 AT 09:00A M, IN DEPT. 005 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2010
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPT 5 RE: MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2010
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (KHEYRI, MAHMOUD) .

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2009
  • ANSWER RECEIVED AS TO (CYRKIN, NINA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2009
  • ANSWER FILED OF (CYRKIN, NINA) INDIVIDUALLY AND ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS (CYRKIN, MICHELLE) . RECEIPT # BH490068014 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2009
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (CYRKIN, NINA) INDIVIDUALLY AND ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS (CYRKIN, MICHELLE) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2009
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY (CYRKIN, NINA) INDIVIDUALLY AND ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS (CYRKIN, MICHELLE) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SATEMENT OF DAMAGES, ADR PACKAGE, CASE COVER SHEET FILED. SERVED AS TO (CYRKIN, MICHELLE) . COSTS OF $ 202.66

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2009
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN BH538847006.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 005 OF HONORABLE BOBBI TILLMON .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2009
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 10/07/09 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 005 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 06/09/09

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SADIGH JAMES K.