Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2016 at 08:57:07 (UTC).

KENLOR MANAGEMENT COMPANY VS. ROS, JOSE JR.

Case Summary

On 05/16/2006 KENLOR MANAGEMENT COMPANY filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ROS, JOSE JR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Clarita Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0380

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Clarita Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KENLOR MANAGEMENT COMPANY

Defendant

ROS JOSE JR.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - FREDERICK L. SPINRAD

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2007
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2007
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 07/09/07 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2006
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 125.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2006
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2006
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 06/13/06 , FOR (KENLOR MANAGEMENT COMPANY) , AGAINST (ROS, JOSE JR.) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 31657 RIDGE ROUTE RD., APT C202, CASTAIC, CA 91384 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2006
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE: EXHIBITS/ DEPOSITION ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED AND MAILED TO PLAINTIFF .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2006
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 29.66 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2006
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # NEW467864001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2006
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (ROS, JOSE JR.) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED. REQUEST FOR CLERK'S JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2006
  • APPLICATION FOR CLERK TO ENTER JUDGMENT FOR IMMEDIATE RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2006
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (KENLOR MANAGEMENT COMPANY) FOR REJECTION OF JUDGMENT PACKET - DUE TO SUBSERVICE ON NAMED DEFENDANT, REQUEST FOR DEFAULT IS PREMATURE. SUBMITTED ON 06/07/06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (ROS, JOSE JR.) , ALL OCCUPANTS . COSTS OF $ 61.50 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2006
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (ROS, JOSE JR.) , NO DEFAULT ENTERED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2006
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF ALL OCCUPANTS . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED. REQUEST FOR CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2006
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2006
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN NEW136370001.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2006
  • SUMMONS FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2006
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 07/21/06 AT 10:30A M, IN DIV. 004 . OSC RE DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SPINRAD FREDERICK LYNN