This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/02/2016 at 07:54:00 (UTC).

KATTAN, DAVID VS. FARAH, DIANE

Case Summary

On 03/30/2010 KATTAN, DAVID filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against FARAH, DIANE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLIE E. BROWN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0285

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LESLIE E. BROWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KATTAN DAVID

Defendants

FARAH DIANE

ASKANDAR PETER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALLEN R. KING - ALLEN R. KING

Attorney at ALLEN R. KING

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2013
  • DocketCASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • DocketPURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 01/18/13 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2011
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY WHOLLY UNSATISFIED. COSTS $ 30.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2010
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED ON 05/20/10 , FOR (KATTAN, DAVID) , AGAINST (FARAH, DIANE) , (ASKANDAR, PETER) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 340 N HAYWORTH AVE., #407, LOS ANGELES, CA 90048 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2010
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # BH490068060 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2010
  • DocketREJECT SHEET SENT TO (KATTAN, DAVID) FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST TO SET FOR TRIAL; NO RESPONSE FILED BY DEFENDANT. DEFAULT RECEIVED. SUBMITTED ON 05/20/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2010
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (FARAH, DIANE) , (ASKANDAR, PETER) , AND CLERK JUDGMT; WRIT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2010
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED. SERVED AS TO (FARAH, DIANE) , (ASKANDAR, PETER) AND AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2010
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK FOR DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO (FARAH, DIANE) , (ASKANDAR, PETER) ON 05/20/10 FILED. DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 0.00 , AND DECLARATON OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2010
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 51.67 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2010
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2010
  • DocketORDER GRANTING SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY POSTING AND MAILING SIGNED AND FILED. JUDGE LESLIE BROWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2010
  • DocketAPPLICATION/DECLARATION AND ORDER ALLOWING SERVICE BY POSTING AND MAILING FOR DIANE FARAH, AND PETER ASKANDAR RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO DEPT. 006 FOR CONSIDERATION. RECEIPT # BH490068019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2010
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN BH490068005.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2010
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2010
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 006 OF HONORABLE LESLIE E. BROWN .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KING, ALLEN R.