Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/11/2016 at 14:22:10 (UTC).

KASOFF, LESLYE VS SHERMAN, JODY

Case Summary

On 06/15/2011 KASOFF, LESLYE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SHERMAN, JODY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD ADLER. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3703

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD ADLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KASOFF LESLYE

Defendants

SHERMAN JODY DBA AAA TLC HEALTH CARE

AAA TLC HEALTH CARE INC.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2012
  • REQUEST FOR CERTIFIED COPY OF RECORD PURSUANT TO SUPBOENA RECEIVED AS TO THE STATE BAR OF CALIFORNIA .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2011
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2011
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 09/19/11 AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (AAA TLC HEALTH CARE INC.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2011
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2011
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM NWY .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2011
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (AAA TLC HEALTH CARE INC.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2011
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (SHERMAN, JODY) DBA (AAA TLC HEALTH CARE) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2011
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 09:30A M, IN DEPT. NWY , HON. RICHARD ADLER PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . DEFENDANT APPEARING .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2011
  • COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2011
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 09/15/11 . FOR (KASOFF, LESLYE) . AGAINST D002 . PRINCIPAL $ 4000.00 . COSTS $ 85.00 . TOTAL $ 4085.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS. (SEE COURT`S ATTACHED DETAILED RULING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2011
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE/POSTPONEMENT OF (SHERMAN, JODY) DBA (AAA TLC HEALTH CARE) IS GRANTED. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIM HEARING ON 09/15/11 AT 01:30P M. IN DEPT. NWZ , CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2011
  • SUBPOENA ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (SHERMAN, JODY) DBA (AAA TLC HEALTH CARE) BY SUB-SERVING GAVE HER NAME AS MICHELLE, BLK HAIR,GLASSES,PURPLE SCRUBS. . COSTS OF $ 00.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (AAA TLC HEALTH CARE INC.) BY SUB-SERVING GAVE HER NAME AS MICHELLE,BLK HAIR,GLASSES,PURPLE SCRUBS. . COSTS OF $ 0.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2011
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # 1110620E9093 . HEARING SET FOR 08/02/11 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. NWZ

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AAA T.L.C. HEALTH CARE INC is a litigant