This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/22/2018 at 18:55:02 (UTC).

KARS, RENE VS. HOERBIGER SERVICE INC

Case Summary

On 09/15/2010 KARS, RENE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HOERBIGER SERVICE INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0871

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KARS RENE

Defendant

HOERBIGER SERVICE INC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2013
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2013
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 12/11/13 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/13/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE VAN NUYS COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM NEW10S00871 TO LAV10SK0871

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2010
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (HOERBIGER SERVICE INC) , BY THOMAS BORGHARD .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2010
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT{S} AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION{S}.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (HOERBIGER SERVICE INC) , MARIE COWAN - OFFICE MANAGER . COSTS OF $ 45.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2010
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN 1100916E3241. HEARING SET FOR 11/12/10 AT 08:30 AM IN DPT. 004.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hoerbiger Service Inc. is a litigant