This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2018 at 18:46:26 (UTC).

KAHLE, JOSEPH VS. LIM, DEREK

Case Summary

On 01/22/2009 KAHLE, JOSEPH filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LIM, DEREK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0129

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Los Angeles Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KAHLE JOSEPH

Defendant

LIM DEREK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2011
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2011
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 12/12/11 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2009
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT{S} AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION{S}.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2009
  • REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER AND ANSWER RE: I ASK THE COURT TO STRIKE THE PROOF OF SERVICE THAT WAS APPARENTLY FILED AND SERVED JULY 14TH. FILED BY (LIM, DEREK) . I HAVE BEEN LIVING OUTSIDE OF THE U.S. SINCE MAY WITH PROOF OF MY TRAVELS (RECEIPTS AND DETAILED ITINERARIES), THEREFORE IT IS IMPOSSIBLE FOR THE PLAINTIFF TO HAVE SERVED ME ON JULY 14TH OR ANYTIME PRIOR TO THAT AND AFTER MAY 13TH. ALSO I DO NOT LIVE IN LOS ANGELE CALIFORNIA. MY LEGAL ADDRESS I IN PHILADELPHIA PA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2009
  • RECEIVED THE SUM OF $ 1.00 FOR PHOTOCOPIES. RECEIPT # LAW539373000 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2009
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER AND ANSWER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2009
  • RECEIVED THE SUM OF $ 1.00 FOR PHOTOCOPIES. RECEIPT # LAW539373005 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (LIM, DEREK) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 07/22/09 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 090 . COSTS OF $ 0.00 . SERVED BY IAN QUAYLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2009
  • MATTER RE-SET FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 07/22/09 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 090 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2009
  • REQUEST FOR RESET FILED 3RD REQUEST (NO SELF ADDRESSED STAMPED ENVELOPE PROVIDED) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2009
  • MATTER RE-SET FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 05/27/09 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 090 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2009
  • REQUEST FOR RESET FILED TIMELY. SELF ADDRESSED STAMPED ENVELOPE PROVIDED. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2009
  • MATTER RE-SET FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 04/03/09 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 090 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2009
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED AS TO (LIM, DEREK) FILED BY PLAINTIFF. NO PROOF OF SERVICE ON FILE. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2009
  • REQUEST FOR RESET FILED UNTIMELY. NO SELF ADDRESSED STAMPED ENVELOPE PROVIDED. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2009
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # LAW539373004 . HEARING SET FOR 02/27/09 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 090

    Read MoreRead Less