This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/19/2016 at 09:09:52 (UTC).

JUDICIAL LEGAL SERVICES, INC. VS JAMISON, GUY

Case Summary

On 02/18/2010 JUDICIAL LEGAL SERVICES, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JAMISON, GUY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GUS GOMEZ. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0198

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GUS GOMEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JUDICIAL LEGAL SERVICES INC.

Defendants

COPPESS MICHAEL JOHN AKA COPPESS MICHAEL

JAMISON GUY AKA JAMISON GUY E.

JAMISON & ASSOCIATES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2015
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO ALHAMBRA RE: RE ASSIGNMENT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/28/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE ALHAMBRA COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM PAS10S00198 TO ALH10SP0198

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2010
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2010
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2010
  • (JAMISON, GUY) AKA (JAMISON, GUY E.) REFUSES TO STIPULATE TO THE JUDGE PRO TEMPORE, CASE IS TRANSFERRED TO DEPT. NEM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2010
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. NEM , HON. GUS GOMEZ PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING IN PRO PER . DEFENDANT APPEARING IN PRO PER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2010
  • COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2010
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 03/30/10 . THE COURT ORDERS THAT THE DEFENDANT(S) DOES NOT OWE PLAINTIFF(S) ANY MONEY ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED BY SHERIFF. SERVED AS TO (COPPESS, MICHAEL JOHN) AKA (COPPESS, MICHAEL) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 03/30/10 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 007 . COSTS OF $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED BY SHERIFF. SERVED AS TO (JAMISON, GUY) AKA (JAMISON, GUY E.) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 03/30/10 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 007 . COSTS OF $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2010
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN PAS011419001. HEARING SET FOR 03/30/10 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. 007.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jamison & Associates, PLLC is a litigant

Latest cases where JUDICIAL LEGAL SERVICES INC. is a litigant