This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/02/2016 at 20:21:55 (UTC).

JTH PROPERTIES,LLC,A CALIFORNI VS. RINI, GINA

Case Summary

On 09/16/2010 JTH PROPERTIES,LLC,A CALIFORNI filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against RINI, GINA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1287

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JTH PROPERTIES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant

RINI GINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN T. HEANEY, A LAW CORPORATION - JOHN T. HEANEY

Attorney at JOHN T. HEANEY, A LAW CORPORATION

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2013
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2013
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 05/28/13 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/20/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE PASADENA COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM NEW10U01287 TO PAS10UK1287

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2010
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 10/19/10 , FOR (JTH PROPERTIES,LLC,A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) , AGAINST (RINI, GINA) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 18820 MANDAN STREET, UNIT #415, SANTA CLARITA, CA 91351 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2010
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE: EXHIBITS/ DEPOSITION ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED AS TO PLAINIFF ONLY .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2010
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 33.17 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2010
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # NEW464091015 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2010
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK PACKAGE RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2010
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (RINI, GINA) , ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2010
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (JTH PROPERTIES,LLC,A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) FOR REJECTION OF CCP 585D DECLARATION; JUDGMENT DOCUMENTS - YOUR DEFENDANT HAS NOT YET BEEN DEFAULTED. NO JUDGMENT MAY BE PROCESSED UNTIL YOU FILE THE REQUEST FOR DEFAULT AND COURT JUDGMENT FORM. SUBMITTED ON 09/30/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS . COSTS OF $ 65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (RINI, GINA) . COSTS OF $ 65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2010
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2010
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN NEW464091014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2010
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2010
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HEANEY JOHN T.