This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/07/2022 at 05:11:15 (UTC).

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. VS. ALMARAZ, ELOY DAVID ORTIZ

Case Summary

On 08/20/2010 JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALMARAZ, ELOY DAVID ORTIZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Huntington Park Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAIME R. CORRAL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1971

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAIME R. CORRAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK N.A.

Defendant

ALMARAZ ELOY DAVID ORTIZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REESE LAW GROUP,A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORP. - HARLAN M. REESE

Attorney at REESE LAW GROUP,A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORP.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2012
  • DocketCASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2012
  • DocketPURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON10/12/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2011
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 002 , HON. JAIMER. CORRAL PRESIDING FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE.NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERSCASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. NO APPEARANCE BY ORFOR THE PLAINTIFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2011
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2011
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY JAIME R.CORRAL TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FORFAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENTPURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(F). MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARINGON 08/15/11 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 002 . CERTIFICATEOF MAILING FILED, GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/ COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2011
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (JPMORGAN CHASEBANK, N.A.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2010
  • DocketREQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (ALMARAZ, ELOY DAVIDORTIZ) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP; DECLARATIONPURSUANT TO 587 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2010
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; OSC/CASEMANAGEMENT REVIEW NOTICE, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT, ADRPACKAGE FILED. SERVED AS TO (ALMARAZ, ELOY DAVID ORTIZ). COSTS OF $ 69.50 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2010
  • DocketDECLARATION OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2010
  • DocketDECLARATION RE: DUE DILIGENCE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2010
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RNHPK478659009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2010
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2010
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TODEPT. 002 OF HONORABLE JAIME R. CORRAL .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2010
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNEDAND FILED BY JAIME R. CORRAL TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONSSHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OFSERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARINGON 02/22/11 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 002 . CERTIFICATEOF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Harlan M Reese