This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/19/2018 at 21:45:07 (UTC).

JP CAPITAL INC. VS. PRICE, KATRINA

Case Summary

On 08/22/2008 JP CAPITAL INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PRICE, KATRINA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KEITH GOFFNEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1865

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KEITH GOFFNEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JP CAPITAL INC. DBA CC CALIFORNIA CASH

Defendant

PRICE KATRINA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2013
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2008
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 09:30A M, IN DEPT. 00N , HON. KEITH GOFFNEY, JUDGE PRO TEM PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . DEFENDANT APPEARING . THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (PRICE, KATRINA) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 09/29/08 AT 09:30A M, IN DEPT. 00N . COSTS OF $ 35.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN COM200000003. HEARING SET FOR 09/29/08 AT 09:30 AM IN DPT. 00N.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.