This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2016 at 11:33:11 (UTC).

JP CAPITAL INC VS. GRAHAM, KATHRYN

Case Summary

On 08/22/2008 JP CAPITAL INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GRAHAM, KATHRYN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KEITH GOFFNEY and WILLIAM R. CHIDSEY, JR. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1864

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KEITH GOFFNEY

WILLIAM R. CHIDSEY, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JP CAPITAL INC DBA CC CALIFORNIA CASH

Defendant

GRAHAM KATHRYN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2013
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 09:30A M, IN DEPT. 00N , HON. WILLIAM R. CHIDSEY, JR. PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF(S) APPEARING IN PRO PER, (X) . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT(S). THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2008
  • MATTER RE-SET FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 12/11/08 AT 09:30A M, IN DEPT. 00N .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 09:30A M, IN DEPT. 00N , HON. KEITH GOFFNEY, JUDGE PRO TEM PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. COURT ORDERS TRIAL OFF CALENDAR. MATTER SET FOR HEARING FOR COURT ORDER COMPLIANCE WHY A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO EFFECT A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 10/27/08 , AT 09:30A M, IN DEPT. 00N .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN COM200000002. HEARING SET FOR 09/29/08 AT 09:30 AM IN DPT. 00N.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.