Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/08/2016 at 05:19:08 (UTC).

JM ASSOCIATES, L.L.C., VS. OUZOUNIAN, TAMAR

Case Summary

On 01/17/2008 JM ASSOCIATES, L L C filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against OUZOUNIAN, TAMAR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Malibu Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is H. JAY FORD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0010

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Malibu Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

H. JAY FORD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JM ASSOCIATES L.L.C. AGENT FOR PEPPERDINE UNIVERSITY

Defendant

OUZOUNIAN TAMAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - D. STEPHEN MONSON

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 01/27/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2009
  • NOTICE/LETTER RE: DISMISSAL RETURNED AS TO (OUZOUNIAN, TAMAR) DUE TO FORWARD TIME EXP. RETURN TO SENDER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2009
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2009
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 003 , HON. H. JAY FORD, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. NO APPEARANCES BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2009
  • NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2009
  • STIPULATION FOR COMMISSIONER TO ACT AS TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2009
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 003 , HON. H. JAY FORD, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE A DISMISSAL . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: THE COURT SETS THE MATTER FOR COURT TRIAL ON 11-17-09 AT 1:30 P.M. IN THIS DEPARTMENT. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF SHALL GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2008
  • MATTER TRANSFERRED TO DIV. 003 . JUDGE MIRA RECUSSES HIMSELF DUE TO HIS ASSOCIATION WITH PEPPERDINE UNIVERSITY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2008
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT AND P & A'S IN SUPPORT THEREOF FILED BY (OUZOUNIAN, TAMAR) AKA: TAMAR OUZONIAN . MATTER NOTICED FOR HEARING ON 04/14/08 AT 08:30A M IN DIV. 001 . RECEIPT # MAL472300006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2008
  • DECLARATION RE: ATTEMPTED SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (OUZOUNIAN, TAMAR) AKA: TAMAR OUZONIAN . COSTS OF $ 0.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2008
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN MAL472300001.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2008
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2008
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2008
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 04/16/08 AT 09:00A M, IN DIV/DEPT. CLK . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 01/17/08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2008
  • CLERK`S NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JM Associates Federal Credit Union is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer D. STEPHEN MONSON