This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/21/2018 at 15:19:02 (UTC).

J.J. LITTLE CO., INC. VS LUXARY LOUNGERS, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/04/2009 J J LITTLE CO , INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LUXARY LOUNGERS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT HARRISON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2067

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT HARRISON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

J. J. LITTLE CO. INC.

Defendant

LUXARY LOUNGERS INC.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2010
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY WHOLLY UNSATISFIED. COSTS $ 0.00 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2009
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. . RECEIPT # LAC205564005 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2009
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (LUXARY LOUNGERS, INC.) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2009
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 090 , HON. ROBERT HARRISON, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2009
  • DocketAUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (J.J. LITTLE CO., INC.) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2009
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 04/09/09 . FOR (J.J. LITTLE CO., INC.) . AGAINST (LUXARY LOUNGERS, INC.) . PRINCIPAL $ 3050.00 . COSTS $ 80.00 . TOTAL $ 3130.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2009
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (LUXARY LOUNGERS, INC.) , AND SERVED AS TO (LUXARY LOUNGERS, INC.) BY SUB-SERVING CARMEN ALARCON, MANAGER . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/09/09 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 . COSTS OF $ 30.00 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2009
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN LAC246987014. HEARING SET FOR 04/09/09 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. 092.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where J. J. LITTLE CO. INC. is a litigant