This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/07/2016 at 11:03:14 (UTC).

INSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE VS HADIMOSYAN, SARGIS

Case Summary

On 01/31/2011 INSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HADIMOSYAN, SARGIS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1318

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE

Defendants

HADIMOSYAN SARGIS

HADIMOSYAN HASMIK

KARAPETYEN ANNA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCLAIN, DEBORAH L.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2013
  • ** CASE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GOVERMNENT CODE SECTION 68151-68153

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2011
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - FILED & ENTERED * * VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - FILED & ENTERED * * VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - FILED & ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2011
  • SUB-SER 3-02-11;DEC DIL;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2011
  • SUB-SER 3-02-11;DEC DIL;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2011
  • SUB-SER 3-02-11;DEC DIL;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2011
  • CMR CLERK'S CERT OF SERVICE MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2011
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2011
  • NON-APP CASE MGMT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 07/20/11, IN DEPT NWH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2011
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INSURANCE EXCHANGE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCLAIN DEBORAH LORRAINE