This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/20/2018 at 20:59:58 (UTC).

IMS CONSTRUCTION, INC. VS. STEEL LOFTS HOA, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/07/2009 IMS CONSTRUCTION, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STEEL LOFTS HOA, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are A. VASQUEZ and CRAIG ROEB. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1303

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

A. VASQUEZ

CRAIG ROEB

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IMS CONSTRUCTION INC.

Defendant

STEEL LOFTS HOA INC.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2014
  • DocketCASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2014
  • DocketPURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 02/21/14 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • Docket* EFFECTIVE 05/13/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • Docket* CASE REASSIGNED TO THE VAN NUYS COURTHOUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • Docket* CASE RENUMBERED FROM NEW09S01303 TO LAV09SK1303

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2010
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 004 , HON. CRAIG ROEB, JUDGE PRO TEM WITH A. VASQUEZ, CLERK PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. ***NO PROOF OF SERVICE FILED FOR TODAY'S DATE***

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2010
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED. MAILED TO PLAINTIFF ONLY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2010
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2009
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN NEW240853002. HEARING SET FOR 01/29/10 AT 08:30 AM IN DPT. 004.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IMS CONSTRUCTION INC. is a litigant