This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/25/2016 at 15:14:07 (UTC).

IEC PROPERTY SERVICES CORPORAT VS. BRICE, MARIA

Case Summary

On 08/22/2008 IEC PROPERTY SERVICES CORPORAT filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BRICE, MARIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JACOB ADAJIAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1600

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JACOB ADAJIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IEC PROPERTY SERVICES CORPORATION

Defendants

BRICE MARIA

ESQUIBEL MATTHEW

AMARAL MARKO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN - TANIA K. CARDOSO

Attorney at KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/20/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE PASADENA COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM CIT08U01600 TO PAS08UJ1600

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2011
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY WHOLLY UNSATISFIED. COSTS $ 30.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2010
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ON BEHALF OF (IEC PROPERTY SERVICES CORPORATION) S.A.S.E. , RECEIPT NO. CIT006486011 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2010
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF (IEC PROPERTY SERVICES CORPORATION) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2010
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF PHONE NUMBER FOR ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF (IEC PROPERTY SERVICES CORPORATION) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2010
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 979.05 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 002 , HON. JACOB ADAJIAN PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT. PLTF. APPEARING BY DEC. CCP 585(D). NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2008
  • ORDER ALLOWING USE OF COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2008
  • DECLARATION RE: DILIGENCE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (ESQUIBEL, MATTHEW) SUBSERVED: MARIA BRICE . COSTS OF $ 40.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP FILED. REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (BRICE, MARIA) , (AMARAL, MARKO) , (ESQUIBEL, MATTHEW) , AND AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS ON 09/11/08 . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2008
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2008
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF HEARING RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE ANY AND ALL PAPERS/DOCUMENTS NECESSARY TO BRING THE MATTER TO TRIAL OR TO EFFECT A FINAL DISPOSITION AS TO ALL ISSUES AND PARTIES TO THE ACTION. ORDER SIGNED AND FILED BY JACOB ADAJIAN . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 10/21/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 002 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN PAID.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.