This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/24/2016 at 21:52:09 (UTC).

IBRAHIM, OLIVIA FAHMY VS L & H LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Case Summary

On 09/27/2011 IBRAHIM, OLIVIA FAHMY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against L H LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EUGENE SALUTE. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8632

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2011

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EUGENE SALUTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IBRAHIM OLIVIA FAHMY

Defendant

L & H LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2012
  • DocketJUDGMENT CREDITOR'S REQUEST TO RECEIVE FUNDS BY MAIL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2011
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS CASE ORDERED TRANSFERRED TO CENTRAL CIVIL COURT FOR CONSOLIDATION WITH CASE NO. 11K18007 . TRANSFER FEE PAID OR NO FEE REQUIRED. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRANSFER FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/ COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2011
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2011
  • DocketAUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (L & H LIMITED PARTNERSHIP) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2011
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2011
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 090 , HON. EUGENE SALUTE, TEMPORARY JUDGE PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL/MOTION TO TRANSFER . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: AN APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR TRANSFER HAVING BEEN FILED, CASE IS ORDERED TRANSFERRED TO CIVIL LIMITED (11K18007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2011
  • DocketRECEIVED THE SUM OF $ 1.00 FOR PHOTOCOPIES. RECEIPT # LAC279625006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2011
  • DocketREQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE/POSTPONEMENT FILED BY (L & H LIMITED PARTNERSHIP) . MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 12/01/11 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 090 . RECEIPT # LAC24453040 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2011
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AS TO (L & H LIMITED PARTNERSHIP) FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 10/31/11 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPARTMENT 090 . SERVICE COSTS: $ 35.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2011
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN LAC279625006. HEARING SET FOR 10/31/11 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. 090.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where L & H LIMITED PARTNERSHIP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant