This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2016 at 10:54:26 (UTC).

IAC SEARCH AND MEDIA VS. CYBERACTIVE

Case Summary

On 02/26/2009 IAC SEARCH AND MEDIA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CYBERACTIVE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DIANA M. WHEATLEY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0735

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

DIANA M. WHEATLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IAC SEARCH AND MEDIA INC. AKA ASK.COM

Defendant

CYBERACTIVE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF MARTIN F. GOLDMAN - JOHN J. CHOW

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MARTIN F. GOLDMAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/29/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 02/29/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2009
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2009
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT PACKAGE FILED. SERVED AS TO (CYBERACTIVE), INC. . COSTS OF $ 37.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2009
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN SM538856013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2009
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 08/26/09 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. CLK . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 03/02/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. WED OF HONORABLE DIANA M. WHEATLEY .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cyberactive Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where IAC SEARCH & MEDIA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ATTORNEY AT LAW - JOHN J. CHOW