This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2016 at 15:34:44 (UTC).

HYETT CORP VS MEJIA, YADIRAH AKA MEJIA, YADI

Case Summary

On 08/22/2008 HYETT CORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MEJIA, YADIRAH AKA MEJIA, YADI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ARTHUR LEDESMA. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2046

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ARTHUR LEDESMA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HYETT CORP DBA WILLIAMS FURNITURE & APPLIANCES AKA WILLIAMS OPTIMA

Defendant

MEJIA YADIRAH AKA MEJIA YADIRA CAROLINA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/13/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE VAN NUYS COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM LAS08S02046 TO LAV08SV2046

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED AFTER 180 DAYS FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY AS FOLLOWS: WHOLLY SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2012
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2011
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 329.26 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2011
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. . RECEIPT # CHA511599015 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. NVR , HON. ARTHUR LEDESMA PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2008
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 10/03/08 . FOR (HYETT CORP) DBA (WILLIAMS FURNITURE & APPLIANCES) AKA (WILLIAMS OPTIMA) . AGAINST (MEJIA, YADIRAH AKA MEJIA, YADIRA CAROLINA) . PRINCIPAL $ 1008.12 . COSTS $ 135.00 . TOTAL $ 1143.12 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2008
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (MEJIA, YADIRAH AKA MEJIA, YADIRA CAROLINA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2008
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2008
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (MEJIA, YADIRAH AKA MEJIA, YADIRA CAROLINA) BY SUB-SERVING FRANCISCO ALDEREDE - CO-TENANT . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 10/03/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. NVR COSTS OF $ 35.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN LAS285314020. HEARING SET FOR 10/03/08 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. NVR.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.